Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995544

EP0995544 - Cooling device for the cutting oil of a machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Service et Technique Mace Thierry
2462, route de Monnaz
74970 Marignier / FR
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Mace, Thierry
2462, route de Monnaz
74970 Marignier / FR
[2000/17]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/22]
Former [2000/17]Gasquet, Denis
CABINET GASQUET, Les Pléiades, Park-Nord Annecy
74370 Metz Tessy / FR
Application number, filing date99410138.418.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateFR1998001334221.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813342
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995544
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q11/10
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   IT,   LI [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Kühlen des Schneidöls einer Werkzeugmaschine[2000/17]
English:Cooling device for the cutting oil of a machine tool[2000/17]
French:Dispositif de refroidissment de l'huile de coupe d'une machine-outil[2000/17]
Examination procedure22.11.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
23.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/03]
10.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3594953  (STADE GERHARD) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 69 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 3,6;
 [X]US5549177  (HOSOKAWA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * figure 4 *;
 [X]US5197537  (CHIGIRA JUNJI [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8,9 * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB1023673  (SIDMOUTH ENGINEERING COMPANY L) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 9 - line 16; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2849286  (KUEMMERLE BRUNO) [A] 1,5,6 * page 10, paragraph 3; figure . *;
 [A]JPH06210542  ;
 [A]JPH0552486  ;
 [A]EP0347821  (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 7 * figure 1 *;
 [PX]DE29802293U  (HELMUT SCHIMPKE INDUSTRIEKUEHL [DE]) [PX] 1,5 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941102), vol. 18, no. 572, Database accession no. (M - 1696), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930709), vol. 17, no. 365, Database accession no. (M - 1442), [A] 1 * abstract *