Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996146

EP0996146 - Process for forming an isolated well in a silicon wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2008
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2001/51]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics SA
7, avenue Gallieni
94250 Gentilly Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Anceau, Christine
46, Rue Principale
37390 Saint Roch / FR
[2000/17]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
1bis, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99410143.422.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateFR1998001354123.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813541
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996146
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/20, H01L21/762, H01L27/06, H01L29/06
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bildung eines isolierten Wannenbereiches in einem Siliziumwafer[2000/17]
English:Process for forming an isolated well in a silicon wafer[2000/17]
French:Procédé de formation d'un caisson isolé dans une plaquette de silicium[2000/17]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
03.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/43]
06.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200608   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2007
31.10.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0405183  (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 1 - line 9 * * column 2, line 16 - line 21 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-5 * * column 5, line 4 - line 51; figure 7 * [A] 4-7 [Y] 2,3;
 [XAY]US4963505  (FUJII TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 28 * * column 2, line 65 - column 2, line 62; figures 8A-8F * [A] 4-7 [Y] 2,3;
 [XA]JPH09223730  ;
 [A]JPH08330581
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 097, no. 012, [X] 1,8 * abstract * [A] 2-7
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 097, no. 004, [A] 1 * abstract *