blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0970642


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.02.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
07.03.2003 (Expected) grant published on  23.04.2003  [2003/17]
21.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.10.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.07.2002 Renewal fee
15.05.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
11.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
02.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
03.03.2000 Change - name/address published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]