blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970642
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0970642Global Dossier 23.04.2003B1
EP0970642 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9808974 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69907078T 26.02.2004T2
DE69907078D 28.05.2003D1
Priority number Date
FR9808974 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2196744T 16.12.2003T3
Priority number Date
FR9808974 08.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2780867 18.08.2000B1
FR2780867 14.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9808974 08.07.1998