blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0970642

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FR 
Examination procedure13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted23.04.2003
Opposition procedure26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 14.04.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:APPLICANT DATA CHANGED
Owner Name:HERGER
 
Event date:19.07.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000522
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE ES FR
 
Event date:23.04.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE ES FR
 
Event date:28.05.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69907078
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030528
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.12.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2196744 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:14.04.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040126
 
Event date:05.07.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20040705
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:10.07.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20040710
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:29.09.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20040929
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:07.07.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050707
 
Event date:01.02.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060201
 
Event date:31.03.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060331
 
Event date:12.05.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20060331
 
Event date:16.10.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20050707