Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970642

EP0970642 - Illuminated shelf [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HERGER
74370 Charvonnex / FR
[2000/16]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
HERGER SA
F-74370 Charvonnex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Rey-Grange, Rodolphe
9 ter avenue d'Albigny
F-74000 Annecy / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Poncet, Jean-François
Cabinet Poncet
7, chemin de Tillier
B.P. 317
74008 Annecy Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Poncet, Jean-François
Cabinet Poncet, 7, chemin de Tillier, B.P. 317
74008 Annecy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99420152.306.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateFR1998000897408.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808974
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970642
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970642
Date:23.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47F11/06
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR [2000/39]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Beleuchtetes Regal[2000/02]
English:Illuminated shelf[2000/02]
French:Etagère lumineuse[2000/02]
Examination procedure22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
04.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DYA]US5758585  (LATCHINIAN JIM S [US]) [DY] 1 * column 5, line 7 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-20 * [A] 2,5,10;
 [DYA]DE3400490  (ELEKTRA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DY] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,5;
 [A]DE2946454  (EAU DE COLOGNE & PARFUEMERIE FABRIK 4711 [DE]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 1 - page 14, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3500870  (KALINNA JUN ERWIN) [A] 1,3,7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0564892  (OHRA REGALANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2710510  (MANDONNAUD SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5758585
 DE3400490