Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996255

EP0996255 - Frame relay network featuring frame relay nodes with controlled oversubscribed bandwidth trunks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2005/11]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Licht, Robert C.
12251 Chinaberry
Manassas, Virginia 20112 / US
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Rausch, Gabriele
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Stuttgart
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]Rausch, Gabriele, Dr.
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart
70430 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/19]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/17]Rausch, Gabriele, Dr. , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99440019.029.01.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateUS19980073139P30.01.1998         Original published format: US 73139 P
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996255
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996255
Date:10.09.2003
[2003/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996255
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/24, H04L12/56
[2003/37]
Former International [2000/17]H04L12/28, H04L12/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2004/23]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rahmenrelaisnetz, gekennzeichnet durch Rahmenrelaisknotenpunkte mit Verbindungsleitungen deren Bandbreite kontrolliert und überreserviert wird[2000/17]
English:Frame relay network featuring frame relay nodes with controlled oversubscribed bandwidth trunks[2000/17]
French:Réseau à relais de trames comportant des noeuds de relais de trame avec des jonctions réseau dont la bande passante est controlée et surréservée[2000/17]
Examination procedure03.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/19]
26.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2005Fee for grant paid
14.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200103   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
SE16.06.2005
ES27.06.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
ES27.06.2005
Former [2006/12]AT16.03.2005
CH16.03.2005
LI16.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT16.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0801481  (ALSTHOM CGE ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1-6,14-17 * page 4, line 41 - line 52 * * page 6, line 24 - line 31 * * page 11, line 37 - line 42 * * page 13, line 12 - line 40 * * page 14, line 25 - line 40 * * page 15, line 11 - line 38 * * page 16, line 20 - line 37 * [Y] 7-13;
 [XPY]US5734654  (SHIRAI NOBUO [JP], et al) [XP] 1 * column 3, line 45 - line 50 * * column 5, line 10 - line 55 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 10 * * column 14, line 9 - line 26 * * figures 3,8,18 * [YP] 7-13;
 [A]EP0719012  (ALCATEL DATA NETWORKS [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 8, line 27 - line 36 *;
 [A]US5521909  (HOLLOWAY MIKE [CA], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 5, line 63 - line 67 *
 [A]  - ULEMA M ET AL, "Access traffic characterization in data networks", GLOBAL DATA NETWORKING, 1993. PROCEEDINGS CAIRO, EGYPT 12-15 DEC. 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19931212), ISBN 0-8186-4270-X, pages 146 - 153, XP010096735 [A] 1,4,5,14 * pages 149-150; chapter 3.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GDN.1993.336575