Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041734

EP1041734 - Radio transmission method in a wireless telecommunications system with pilot and data channels estimation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2000/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Mortensen, Ivar, Dr.
Rossbühlstrasse 2
70825 Korntal / DE
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Brose, Gerhard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Brose, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99440066.131.03.1999
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1041734
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/25]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Funkübertragungsverfahren in einem drahtlosen Übertragungssytem mit Pilot- und Datenkanal Schätzung[2000/40]
English:Radio transmission method in a wireless telecommunications system with pilot and data channels estimation[2000/40]
French:Procédé de transmission radio dans un système de communications sans fil avec de l'estimation de canal pilote et de canal de données[2000/40]
Examination procedure23.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/03]
01.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0858175  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 44 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 38 * * column 8, line 14 - line 39 * * column 10, line 25 - line 38 * * column 12, line 49 - line 57 * * column 13, line 47 - column 14, line 54 * * figures 4-8 *;
 [XA]WO9739557  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 2 * * page 9, line 31 - page 12, line 18 * * figure 7; claim 1 * [A] 6-9;
 [A]EP0605955  (GLENAYRE ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1,6-9 * page 4, line 24 - line 42 * * page 7, line 23 - line 52 * * figures 3,6; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0898381  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,6-9 * column 2, line 8 - line 53 * * column 3, line 17 - line 27 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 1 * * figures 2-4 *