Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974887

EP0974887 - Indexing finger without play for an indexing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 5052
Troy, Michigan 48007 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 5052
Troy Michigan 48007 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ruegenberg, Roland
Schubertstrasse 16
77694 Kehl / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Littolff, Denis
Meyer & Partenaires
2 rue de Dublin
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Littolff, Denis
Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Application number, filing date99440171.930.06.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateFR1998000843830.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9808438
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974887
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974887
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974887
Date:14.06.2006
Language:FR
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G05G5/06, G05G23/02
[2004/03]
Former International [2000/04]G05G5/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spielfreier Indexierungsfinger für Indexierungsvorrichtung[2000/04]
English:Indexing finger without play for an indexing device[2000/04]
French:Doigt d'indexage sans jeu pour mécanisme d'indexation[2000/04]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
28.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2006Fee for grant paid
24.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19607668  (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 17 * * figures 1,7 *;
 [A]EP0345161  (JAEGER) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 9; figures 1,2 *