Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974273

EP0974273 - Method of injection of a suspension of particles of fish meat into fish pieces, particularly tuna [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.07.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.09.2002  [2002/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saupiquet S.A.
17 boulevard Gaston Doumergue, BP 50209
44202 Nantes / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Vouille, Dominique
7, rue des Déportés
44200 Reze / FR
02 / Fouillet, Christine
1, rue des Treilles
44860 Pont Saint Martin / FR
03 / Jacquier, Jean-Louis
7, avenue Bascher
44000 Nantes / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Ph. , et al
Cabinet Arbousse Bastide 6 Rue de Rungis
67200 Strasbourg / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/28]Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe , et al
Cabinet Arbousse Bastide 6, rue de Rungis
67200 Strasbourg / FR
Former [2000/04]Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe
Cabinet Arbousse Bastide, 5, place du Corbeau
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Application number, filing date99440193.309.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateFR1998000958724.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809587
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974273
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/325, A23L1/326
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesAL06.07.2000
LT06.07.2000
LV06.07.2000
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Einspritzung einer Suspension von Fischfleischteilchen in Fischstücken, insbesondere Thunfisch[2000/04]
English:Method of injection of a suspension of particles of fish meat into fish pieces, particularly tuna[2000/04]
French:Procédé d'injection d'une suspension de particules de chair de poisson dans des pieces de poisson, notamment du thon.[2000/04]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
01.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/36]
02.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DXY]EP0419080  (COZZINI INC) [DX] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2;
 [YA]US4301180  (SIMON FRANK J ET AL) [Y] 2 * column 2, lines 20-45 * * column 4, lines 37-40; claims 1-10 * [A] 1,3-12;
 [A]EP0704159  (FAVA ANTONIO ;RIZZOLI EMILIO (IT)) [A] 1-12 * examples 1-3; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH06189716  ;
 [A]US4407831  (SWARTZ WILLIAM E) [A] 1-12 * column 1, lines 65-67; claims 1-9 * * column 2, lines 44-48 *;
 [A]US5256433  (NAKAMURA MAKOTO ET AL) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]JPH04341162  ;
 [A]WO9502337  (UNILEVER PLC ;UNILEVER NV (NL)) [A] 1-12 * page 4, paragraph 1; claims 1-19 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941013), vol. 018, no. 537, Database accession no. (C - 1260), & JP06189716 A 19940712 (HARIMA CHEM INC;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930414), vol. 017, no. 190, Database accession no. (C - 1048), & JP04341162 A 19921127 (NICHIMO CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract *