blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0990791

EP0990791 - Electromagnetic pressure regulating valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.05.2005  [2005/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton
17 Avenue Prince Héréditaire Albert
98000 Monaco / MC
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Desaint, Gérard
11, chemin des Rigaudis
06500 Menton / FR
02 / Magnaval, Jean-Louis
248, boulevard de Provence
06700 Saint Laurent du Var / FR
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Littolff, Denis
Meyer & Partenaires
2 rue de Dublin
67300 Schiltigheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Littolff, Denis
Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles
67000 Strasbourg / FR
Application number, filing date99440260.028.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateFR1998001226629.09.1998         Original published format: FR 9812266
[2000/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990791
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990791
Date:26.05.2004
Language:FR
[2004/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:F02M59/46, F02M63/02, G05D16/20
[2000/14]
CPC:
F02M63/025 (EP,US); F02M63/0052 (EP); G05D16/2022 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Electromagnetisches Druckregelventil[2000/14]
English:Electromagnetic pressure regulating valve[2000/14]
French:Electrovanne de régulation de pression[2000/14]
Examination procedure16.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
05.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2004Fee for grant paid
11.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE3439378  (HELLER HYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * page 8, line 13 - page 13, line 14; figure - * [A] 11;
 [A]EP0267162  (WEBER SRL [IT]) [A] 1-5,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0254483  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19606318  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 29 - line 48; figure . *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.