Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997765

EP0997765 - Optical waveguide switch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avanex Corporation
40919 Encyclopedia Circle
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2004/02]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lösch, Kurt, Dr.
Birkenwaldstrasse 165A
70191 Stuttgart / DE
02 / Keil, Norbert
Am Rathauspark 24
13437 Berlin / DE
03 / Weinert, Carl Michael, Dr.
Memelingstrasse 8a
12203 Berlin / DE
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Haines, Miles John L.S. , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]Haines, Miles John , et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/18]Rausch, Gabriele, Dr. , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99440276.615.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateDE199814986229.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19849862
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0997765
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0997765
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/01, G02F1/313
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Optischer Wellenleiter-Schalter[2000/18]
English:Optical waveguide switch[2000/18]
French:Commutateur optique pour guide d'ondes[2000/18]
Examination procedure18.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/18]
18.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0905546  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [PX] 1-7 * paragraphs [0014] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] * * figures 3,5,7-11; examples 3,4,6-8 *;
 [A]US5159699  (DE MONTS HUMBERT [FR]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 2, lines 4-24 * * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 12; figures 1-5,8 *
 [A]  CHU S T ET AL, "VERSATILE STACKED ARROW CROSSCONNECT FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL OPTICAL INTERCONNECTS", ELECTRONICS LETTERS,GB,IEE STEVENAGE, (19950105), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 33 - 35, XP000504152 [A] 1,5,6 * page 34, column L, paragraph 1 - page 35, column L, paragraph 1; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19950034
 [A]  ISAMU KATO ET AL, "MULTISTRUCTURED OPTICAL IC ELEMENTS BY POLYMER THIN FILMS", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN,US,SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, (19830201), vol. 66, no. 2, pages 106 - 110, XP000001637 [A] 1,2,6 * Kapitel 1. und 2. *; page 109, column R, line 14 - page 110, column R, line 11 *