Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022890

EP1022890 - Call centre [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Hägebarth, Frank
Heuchelbergstrasse 3
74366 Kirchheim / DE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Brose, Gerhard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Brose, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99440366.520.12.1999
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateDE199910183019.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901830
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022890
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022890
Date:03.12.2003
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04M3/51, H04M3/493
[2003/49]
Former International [2000/30]H04M3/51
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:Anrufzentrale[2000/30]
English:Call centre[2000/30]
French:Centre d'appels[2000/30]
Examination procedure01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/01]
09.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.07.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9800957  (NORTHAMERICOM CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 8, line 25 - page 11, line 19 *;
 [X]WO9859455  (PERETTI GIULIO [IT]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9810576  (PROFIT THRU TELECOMMUNICATIONS [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5661787  (POCOCK MICHAEL H [CA]) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 55 *;
 [X]WO9427258  (INTERACTIVE TELEVISION SYSTEMS [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 13, line 6 - page 33, line 19 *