Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974943

EP0974943 - Method for processing information coming from identified owners in order to allow data emission back to those owners [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bertrand, André
Avenue Jean Charles Napp, Chemin des Cressauds
13400 Aubagne / FR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Berard, Jean
20 Rue des Chevreuils
33370 Artigues Pres Bordeaux / FR
02 / Bertrand, André
Avenue Jean Charles Napp
Chemin des Cressauds, 13400 Aubagne / FR
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Thébault, Jean-Louis
SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Thébault, Jean-Louis
Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
Application number, filing date99450015.506.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateFR1998000885307.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808853
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974943
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G07G1/00, G06F17/60
[2000/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verarbeiten von Informationen über identifizierte Inhaber zum Zwecke der Rückübertragung von Daten an diese Inhaber[2000/04]
English:Method for processing information coming from identified owners in order to allow data emission back to those owners[2000/04]
French:Procédé de traitement d'informations provenant de titulaires identifiés, en vue de permettre l'émission de données en retour vers lesdits titulaires[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
13.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0512509  (CATALINA MARKETING INT) [Y] 1-4 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 50 * * column 4, line 18 - line 53 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 44 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 16 * * column 9, line 44 - column 11, line 42 *;
 [Y]US5459306  (STEIN BUDDY ET AL) [Y] 1-4 * column A; figure - * * column 3, line 52 - column 8, line 60 *;
 [A]WO9720279  (INTER ACT SYSTEMS INC) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 6, line 2 - page 11, line 15 *;
 [A]WO9214213  (CATALINA MARKETING INT);
 [A]US5537314  (KANTER MARK W);
 [A]EP0786746  (MARKETLINK)