blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976671

EP0976671 - Device for palletising with feeding the empty pallets from above [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cetec Industrie Conditionnement
ZA les Gabarres
24650 Chancelade / FR
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / LABRUE Jean-Claude
La Sauvagie, Château LEVEQUE
F-24460 AGONAC / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Thébault, Jean-Louis
SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Thébault, Jean-Louis
Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
Application number, filing date99450016.327.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateFR1998000979727.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809797
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976671
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B65G57/06, B65G57/24
[2000/05]
CPC:
B65G57/035 (EP); B65G57/06 (EP); B65G57/245 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Palettiervorrichtung mit Zufuhr der leeren Paletten von oben[2000/05]
English:Device for palletising with feeding the empty pallets from above[2000/05]
French:Dispositif de palettisation comprenant une alimentation de palettes vides par le haut[2000/05]
Examination procedure29.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
03.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
05.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/29]
03.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE2258873  (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [A] 3-5;
 [A]US5494400  (MENDOZA ROEL [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *
by applicantEP0562197
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.