Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994529

EP0994529 - Zero insertion force connector with plug and socket having C-shaped contacts and pins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.10.2006  [2006/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société Anonyme dite: Framatome Connectors International
Tour Framatome, 1 Place de la Coupole
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Cappe, Patrice
7 Route de Rambouillet
28210 Faverolles / FR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Thébault, Jean-Louis
SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Thébault, Jean-Louis
Cabinet Thébault 111 cours du Médoc
33300 Bordeaux / FR
Application number, filing date99450019.723.08.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateFR1998001078824.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810788
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994529
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/193
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Steckverbinder mit geringer Einsteck- und Herausziehkraft und C-förmigen Kontakten und Messerkontakten[2000/16]
English:Zero insertion force connector with plug and socket having C-shaped contacts and pins[2000/16]
French:Connecteur avec fiche et embase à faible force d'insertion, notamment du type à contacts broche/lyre[2000/16]
Examination procedure27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
09.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/41]
29.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
03.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0244192  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-6,10-16 * page 4, line 5 - line 15 * * page 6, line 7 - page 10, line 2 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [AD]US4718859  (GARDNER MICHAEL J [US]) [AD] 1,2,5,9 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 25 * * column 5, line 35 - line 57 * * column 6, line 22 - line 44 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 9 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2351659  (AMP INC) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * page 5, paragraph 8 - page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph L - page 8 * * figures 1-5 *