Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971297

EP0971297 - Method for global clock circuit routing and placement on an integrated circuit and associated devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2001/51]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
94250 Gentilly / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fluxman, Steven
c/o Cabinet Ballot Schmit, 18 Place du Forum
57000 Metz / FR
02 / Monk, Trevor
c/o Cabinet Ballot Schmit, 18 Place du Forum
57000 Metz / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Novagraaf Technologies
11 rue Graham Bell
57070 Metz / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Bentz, Jean-Paul , et al
Cabinet Ballot 9 rue Claude Chappe
57070 Metz / FR
Former [2000/02]Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 18, Place du Forum
57000 Metz / FR
Application number, filing date99470016.930.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateFR1998000900810.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809008
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971297
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971297
Date:26.09.2001
Language:FR
[2001/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50, G06F1/10
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anordnung der Leitungsführung einer zentralen Taktgeberschaltung auf einem integrierten Schaltkreis sowie zugehörige Vorrichtungen[2000/46]
English:Method for global clock circuit routing and placement on an integrated circuit and associated devices[2000/02]
French:Procédé de placement-routage d'un circuit d'horloge globale sur un circuit intégré, et dispositifs associés[2000/02]
Former [2000/02]Verfahren zur Anordnung der Leitungsführung einer zentralen Taktgeberschaltung auf einem integrierten Schaltkreis sowie zugehörigen Vorrichtungen
Examination procedure15.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
16.12.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
28.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.03.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2001Fee for grant paid
13.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT26.09.2001
DE28.12.2001
[2008/17]
Former [2003/17]DE28.12.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US5012427  (KURIBAYASHI MOTOTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,9,11-14 * column A; figures 1-4,7,8,15 *;
 [A]US5481209  (LIM RAYMOND H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,12-14 * column 4, line 5 - line 67; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0544164  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,10,13,14 * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 11; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5564022  (DEBNATH GOUTAM [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12-14 * column A; figures 3,4B,4C *;
 [A]US5570045  (ERDAL APO C [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,13,14 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 30; figure 4 *;
 [A]  GANGULY S ET AL, "Clock Distribution Methodology for PowerPCTM Microprocessors", JOURNAL OF VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING, NL, (19970601), vol. 16, no. 2/03, pages 181 - 189, XP000692609 [A] 1-3,10,13,14 * page 183, column R, paragraph 2 - page 184, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 186, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007991007969