EP1052439 - Safety valve for fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valvulas Arco, S.A. Avda. del Cid, 8 46134 Foyos (Valencia) / ES | [2000/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrer Beltran, José Ma Avda. del Cid, 8 46134 Foyos (Valencia) / ES | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/33] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Canadell-Isern, Roberto Travessera de Gracia 30, 1 C 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 99500080.9 | 13.05.1999 | [2000/46] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1052439 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1052439 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06, F16K27/06 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
F16K27/067 (EP,US);
F16K5/0636 (EP,US);
F16K5/0694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] | Extension states | AL | 10.06.1999 | LT | 10.06.1999 | LV | 10.06.1999 | MK | 10.06.1999 | RO | 10.06.1999 | SI | 10.06.1999 | Title | German: | Sicherheitsventil für Fluide | [2000/46] | English: | Safety valve for fluids | [2000/46] | French: | Robinet de sécurité pour fluides | [2000/46] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | BE | 11.08.2004 | CH | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | DE | 12.11.2004 | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/03] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
DE | 12.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
BE | 11.08.2004 | ||
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
CH | 11.08.2004 | ||
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3506240 (MODRIN LOUIS) [A] 1 * figures 8-10 *; | [A]US4026516 (MATOUSEK STEPHEN) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0390981 (FERRERO RUBINETTERIA S N C DI [IT]) [A] 1 * figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0458980 (ASAHI ORGANIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]US5735307 (CHARRON CHARLES S [CA]) [A] 1 * figures 1-9 * |