blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1056225

EP1056225 - Method and system for extending coverage of a radiocommunication system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Espana, S.A.
Ramirez de Prado, 5
28045 Madrid / ES
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Heras Brandin, Alberto
Ramirez de Prado, 5
28045 Madrid / ES
02 / Gomez Mateo, Daniel
Ramirez de Prado, 5
28045 Madrid / ES
03 / Izquierdo Arce, Jesus
Ramirez de Prado, 5
28045 Madrid / ES
04 / Bartolome Pascual, Purificacion
Ramirez de Prado, 5
28045 Madrid / ES
05 / Lopez Almansa, Eugenio
Ramirez de Prado, 5
28045 Madrid / ES
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al
Elzaburu S.L.P.
Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al
Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Former [2000/48]Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al
Elzaburu S.A., Miguel Angel, 21
28010 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date99500087.427.05.1999
[2000/48]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1056225
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/26
[2000/48]
CPC:
H04B7/2628 (EP); H04B7/2643 (EP); H04W16/26 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/33]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Ausdehnung des Deckungsbereichs eines Radio-Kommunikationssystems[2000/48]
English:Method and system for extending coverage of a radiocommunication system[2000/48]
French:Méthode et système pour amplifier la portée d'un système de radiocommunications[2000/48]
Examination procedure30.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/15]
22.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/15]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
23.07.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0876008  (SIEMENS AG ;FRANCE TELECOM (FR)) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 4, line 51 - column 7, line 16 * * figures 3,4; claims 1,2,8 * [Y] 1-4;
 [Y]EP0670640  (TELIA AB) [Y] 1-4 * column 4, line 15 - line 27 * * figure 3; claims 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.