Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0965400

EP0965400 - Method and apparatus for riveting plastics parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rabasso, Emilio Pujadas
Sant Joan, 96 08184 Palau de Plegamans
Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
Rabasso, Emilio Pujadas
Sant Joan, 96
08184 Palau de Plegamans, Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso , et al
DURAN-CORRETJER
Còrsega, 329
(Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal)
08037 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]Duran Moya, Luis-Alfonso , et al
DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101
08008 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date99500102.111.06.1999
[1999/51]
Priority number, dateES1998000126116.06.1998         Original published format: ES 9801261
[1999/51]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0965400
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0965400
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/60, F15B15/28, F28D1/03, B21J15/08, F16B19/08
[2000/40]
Former International [1999/51]B21J15/08, F16B19/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/32]
Former [1999/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zum Vernieten von Plastikteilen[1999/51]
English:Method and apparatus for riveting plastics parts[1999/51]
French:Procédé et dispositif de rivetage pour pièces en matière plastique[1999/51]
Examination procedure20.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
23.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/50]
15.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE29507066U  (KIEFEL GMBH PAUL [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [XY]US5018957  (ASSINK KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 52 * * column 3, line 32 - line 35 * * column 3, line 60 - line 63 * [Y] 4;
 [XY]US5423938  (HOFIUS SR DAVID V [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4;
 [X]US5308427  (DUHAIME DANIEL M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 66 - line 68 *;
 [Y]JPH1098263  ;
 [Y]JPH05185207  ;
 [A]US5227173  (SHERWOOD ROBERT D [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0618061  (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH04142919
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, [Y] 4 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931109), vol. 017, no. 607, Database accession no. (M - 1507), [Y] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920904), vol. 016, no. 422, Database accession no. (M - 1305), [A] 1 * abstract *