Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974373

EP0974373 - Syringe with two variable volume chambers for containing and administering mixtures of products provided separately [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Szapiro Melamed, Jaime Luis
1641 Tabaré
Buenos Aires / AR
For all designated states
Moreno Bonino, Saul
Tabaré 1641
Buenos Aires / AR
For all designated states
Szames Yungelson, Leonardo
Tabaré 1641
Buenos Aires / AR
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Toro Gordillo, Ignacio Maria
Viriato, 56
28010 Madrid / ES
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99500121.116.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateAR1998000353620.07.1998         Original published format: AR 9803536
[2000/04]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974373
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974373
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/315, A61M5/28
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
Former [2000/41](deleted) 
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spritze mit zwei volumenvariablen Kammern zum Verabreichen von gemischten Produkten die separat geliefert werden[2000/04]
English:Syringe with two variable volume chambers for containing and administering mixtures of products provided separately[2000/04]
French:Seringue avec deux chambres à volume variable pour contenir et administrer un mélange de produits livrés séparement[2000/04]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
04.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2003Fee for grant paid
12.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
PT15.03.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
CY15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/52]AT15.10.2003
BE15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/41]AT15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
DK15.01.2004
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/33]AT15.10.2003
CH15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
LI15.10.2003
NL15.10.2003
GR15.01.2004
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI15.10.2003
SE15.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE15.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0695555  (HIGASHIKAWA TETSURO [JP]) [A] 1-4,6 * column 13, line 24 - column 14, line 30 * * figures 18-20B *;
 [A]EP0511183  (KABI PHARMACIA AB [SE]) [A] 1,7,8 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0112574  (MEDITEC SA [LU]) [A] 1-4 * page 9, line 10 - page 11, line 29 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]GB2229374  (BESPAK PLC [GB]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 40, line 18 - line 31; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2450263  (GRUENENTHAL CHEMIE) [A] 1,7,8 * page 2, paragraph L; figure - *