Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974795

EP0974795 - Sealing joint for a refrigerator door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2005/47]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BSH Fabricacion, S.A.
Factoria Esquiroz, Camino de Mendi, s/n
31191 Esquiroz (Navarra) / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Kutschera, Horst
St. Wolfgangs, Pl. 9C
81669 München / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Thoma, Lorenz , et al
BSH Hausgeräte GmbH
Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Thoma, Lorenz , et al
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH, Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Ungria Lopez, Javier , et al
Avda. Ramon y Cajal, 78
28043 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date99500127.824.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateES1998000156724.07.1998         Original published format: ES 9801567
[2000/04]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0974795
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0974795
Date:02.02.2000
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974795
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/42]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abdichtungsvorrichtung für Kühlschranktür[2000/04]
English:Sealing joint for a refrigerator door[2000/04]
French:Joint d'étanchéité pour porte de réfrigérateur[2000/04]
Examination procedure31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
03.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2005Fee for grant paid
18.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2001
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5309680  (KIEL LOWELL M [US]) [X] 1,3 * figure 4; claim 9 * [Y] 2,4,7;
 [Y]DE8608497U  (ILPEA S.P.A.) [Y] 2,4,7 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3525539  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE29520234U  (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0757151  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2048858  (IRE IND RIUNITE) [A] 6;
 [A]DE29619300U  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [A] 7