blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1003136

EP1003136 - "Improved vending machine for solid products" [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.07.2001
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2001 [2001/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gesvending S.L.
R. Isaac Peral 19 B, Parque Tecnologico
46980 Paterna / ES
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Herrera Hernandez, Inmaculada
R. Isaac Peral 19B, Parque Tecnologico
46980 Paterna / ES
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Marques Alos, Fernando
Tuset, 34
08006 Barcelona / ES
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date99500162.516.09.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateES1998000290418.11.1998         Original published format: ES 9802904
[2000/21]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003136
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:G07F11/00, G07F13/00
[2000/21]
CPC:
G07F13/00 (EP); G07F17/0064 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/06]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein verbesserter Verkaufsautomat für feste Produkte[2000/21]
English:"Improved vending machine for solid products"[2000/21]
French:Amélioration d'une machine de vente pour des produits solides[2000/21]
Examination procedure25.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/37]
29.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.01.2001M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4121707  (JACOBS PHILIP F, et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - line 68 * * column 2, line 65 - line 68 * * claims 1,6,9,10 * * figures 1,13 *;
 [Y]US4823984  (FICKEN LEONARD A [US]) [Y] 1-4 * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 3 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5555793  (TOCCHET IVAN [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 47 - line 49 * * column 4, line 27 - line 41 * * figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.