Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993228

EP0993228 - Integrated circuit for the access interface with the local telephone network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefónica, S.A.
Gran Via, 28
28013 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Telefonica, S.A.
Gran Via, 28
28013 Madrid / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Calvo Torre, Fermin./Telefonica, S.A.
General Peron, 40-B 1a Planta
28028 Madrid / ES
02 / Pena Melian, Jesus
Telefonica, S.A.
General Peron, 40 B-1a Planta
28028 Madrid / ES
03 / Conesa Lareo, Jose
Telefonica, S.A.
General Peron, 40 - B 1a Planta
28028 Madrid. / ES
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros 1
28014 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 21
28014 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date99500165.817.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateES1998000195417.09.1998         Original published format: ES 9801954
[2000/15]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993228
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993228
Date:09.11.2005
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:Integrierte Schaltung für die Zugriffsschnittstelle mit dem Lokalen Fernsprechnetz[2000/15]
English:Integrated circuit for the access interface with the local telephone network[2000/15]
French:Circuit intégré pour l'interface d'accès avec le réseau téléphonique local[2000/15]
Examination procedure29.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/21]
21.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/42]
12.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XL]EP0841784  (TELEFONICA NACIONAL ESPANA CO [ES]) [XL] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5043884  (KUHLMANN KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 46 - column 7, line 56 * * figure 1 *