Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998044

EP0998044 - Clock retriever based on direct digital synthesis for the adaptive method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.10.2002
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.11.2002  [2002/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefónica, S.A.
Gran Via, 28
28013 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Telefonica, S.A.
Gran Via, 28
28013 Madrid / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Olmos González, Pedro
c/o Telefonica S.A. General Peron,40-B 1a Planta
28020 MADRID / ES
02 / Merayo Fernández, Luis Antonio
c/0 Telefonica S.A. General Peron, 40-B 1a Planta
28020 MADRID / ES
[2000/32]
Former [2000/18]01 / Olmos González, Pedro
c/o Telefonica S.A. General Peron,40-B 1a Planta
28028 MADRID / ES
02 / Merayo Fernández, Luis Antonio
c/0 Telefonica S.A. General Peron, 40-B 1a Planta
28028 MADRID / ES
Representative(s)Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros 1
28014 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Carpintero Lopez, Francisco
HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 21
28014 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date99500178.106.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateES1998000225828.10.1998         Original published format: ES 9802258
[2000/18]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0998044
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/099
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Taktregenerator mit direkter digitaler Synthese für das adaptive Verfahren[2000/18]
English:Clock retriever based on direct digital synthesis for the adaptive method[2000/18]
French:Régénérateur d'horloge utilisant la synthèse numérique directe pour la méthode adaptative[2000/18]
Examination procedure01.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/47]
17.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/47]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Not yet paid