Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052066

EP1052066 - Adjustable pliers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUPER-EGO TOOLS S.A.
Carretera Durango-Elorrio Km2
E-48220 Abadiano (Vizcaya) / ES
[2000/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Azkona Ollacarizqueta, Manuel
Carretera Durango-Elorrio, km. 2
48220 Abadiano (Vizcaya) / ES
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel
Consultores Urizar y Cia, S.L. Gordoniz 22 5[deg]
48012 Bilbao Vizcaya / ES
[2009/29]
Former [2001/31]Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel
Gordoniz, 22-5 P.O.Box 6454
48012 Bilbao (Vizcaya) / ES
Former [2000/46]Urizar Barandiaran, Miguel Angel
Licenciado Poza, 56
48013 Bilbao (Vizcaya) / ES
Application number, filing date99500243.315.12.1999
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateES19990001131U03.05.1999         Original published format: ES 9901131 U
[2000/46]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1052066
Date:15.11.2000
Language:FR
[2000/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1052066
Date:29.11.2000
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052066
Date:22.02.2006
Language:FR
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B25B7/10
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2005/35]
Former [2001/33]AT,  DE,  DK,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  PT,  SE 
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einstellbare Zange[2000/46]
English:Adjustable pliers[2000/46]
French:Pince adaptable[2000/46]
Examination procedure29.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/30]
22.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2005Fee for grant paid
15.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/17]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
Former [2006/49]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
Former [2006/46]FI22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
Former [2006/36]FI22.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[PX]DE19806653  (WEGERHOFF H ALARM WERKZEUG [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 17; figure - *;
 [A]DE969920  (CARL WALTER FABRIK FUER BERGWE) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 82-106; figure - *;
 [A]EP0861707  (WILL WERKZEUGFABRIK GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 7; figure - *;
 [DA]DE2031661  (P. SOUTEYRAT) [DA] 1 * figure - *;
 [DA]US4269089  (HASTINGS CHARLES E) [DA] 1 * figure - *