Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040843

EP1040843 - A guidewire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WILLIAM COOK EUROPE A/S
Sandet 6
4632 Bjaeverskov / DK
For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike, P.O. Box 489
Bloomington, IN 47402-0489 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
WILLIAM COOK EUROPE A/S
Sandet 6
4632 Bjaeverskov / DK
For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike, P.O. Box 489
Bloomington, IN 47402-0489 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Klint, Henrik So̸nderskov
Einarsvej 23c
2800 Lyngby / DK
 [2005/36]
Former [2000/40]01 / Klint, Henrik Sonderskov
Einarsvey 23c
2800 Lyngby / DK
Representative(s)Indahl, Peter Jensen , et al
Awapatent A/S
Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Indahl, Peter Jensen , et al
c/o Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23
2630 Taastrup / DK
Application number, filing date99610024.429.03.1999
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040843
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040843
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/01
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
Extension statesAL03.04.2001
LT03.04.2001
LV03.04.2001
MK03.04.2001
RO03.04.2001
SI03.04.2001
TitleGerman:Ein Führungsdraht[2000/40]
English:A guidewire[2000/40]
French:Un fil de guidage[2000/40]
Examination procedure04.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
21.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2005Fee for grant paid
07.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200305   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
CY28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/17]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
IT28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/21]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
LU31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/50]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
ES08.01.2006
PT28.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/46]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
PT28.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/34]AT28.09.2005
BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/33]BE28.09.2005
CH28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
LI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE28.09.2005
FI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
PT28.02.2006
Former [2006/22]FI28.09.2005
NL28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
Former [2006/15]FI28.09.2005
GR28.12.2005
SE28.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI28.09.2005
SE28.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0820782  (TARGET THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * column A * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 33 - line 44 * * column 5, line 13 - line 35 * * column 11, line 28 - column 12, line 44; figures 1,2,4-6 *;
 [A]WO9816274  (CATHGUIDE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column A * * column 2, line 5 - column 4, line 30 * * column 7, line 22 - line 29 * * column 8, line 14 - column 9, line 6; figures 8-11 *;
 [A]EP0369383  (CORDIS CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * column A * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 46 * * column 3, line 15 - line 33 * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 1; claims 1-3,16 *;
 [A]US5702373  (SAMSON GENE [US]) [A] 1-14 * column A * * column 12, line 13 - line 28 * * column 13, line 6 - line 27; figures 2,3,5. *;
 [A]US5238004  (SAHATJIAN RONALD [US], et al);
 [A]US4003369  (HEILMAN MARLIN S, et al)
by applicantUS4619274
 US5001825