Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973345

EP0973345 - Apparatus and method for transmitting and registering calls for assistance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coons, Benton Sill
19185 Edgewood Lane Prior Lake
Minnesota 55372 / US
For all designated states
Coons, Kenneth James
1782 Marshall Avenue St. Paul
Minnesota 55104 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Coons, Benton Sill
19185 Edgewood Lane
Prior Lake, Minnesota 55372 / US
For all designated states
Coons, Kenneth James
1782 Marshall Avenue
St. Paul, Minnesota 55104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S
Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007
1021 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date99610040.014.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateUS1998011599815.07.1998         Original published format: US 115998
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973345
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973345
Date:03.01.2001
[2001/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/20
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Aussendung und Registrierung von Notrufen[2000/03]
English:Apparatus and method for transmitting and registering calls for assistance[2000/03]
French:Appareil et méthode pour la transmission et la régistration d'appels d'urgence[2000/03]
Examination procedure03.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
10.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5377256  (FRANKLIN PHILIP G [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 57 * * claim - *;
 [A]US4724538  (FARRELL EDWARD P [US]) [A] 1,15 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 53 *;
 [A]GB2283604  (JAMES MICHAEL ROBIN [GB]) [A] 1,15 * page 5, line 17 - page 9, line 17 *