Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994020

EP0994020 - Method and system for filling ice cream into cup shaped containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430
1009 Pully / CH
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Tetra Pak Hoyer A/S
Soren Nymarks Vej 13
8270 Hojbjerg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Mandsberg, Soren
Sondergade 32, 3
6000 Kolding / DK
[2000/17]
Former [2000/16]01 / Mandsberg, Soren
Bjerggade 42 st.
DK-6000 Kolding / DK
Representative(s)Elmeros, Claus , et al
Patentgruppen ApS
Arosgaarden
Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]Elmeros, Claus , et al
Patentgruppen ApS, Arosgaarden, Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Former [2001/49]Nielsen, Leif , et al
K. Skott-Jensen Patentigeniorer A/S Lemmingvej 225
8361 Hasselager / DK
Former [2000/16]Skoett-Jensen, Knud
K. Skoett-Jensen Patentingenioerer A/S Lemmingvej 225
8361 Hasselager / DK
Application number, filing date99610066.518.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateDK1998000132916.10.1998         Original published format: DK 132998
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994020
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994020
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65B3/28, B65B43/59, A23G9/28
[2002/14]
Former International [2000/16]B65B3/28, B65B43/59
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Füllen von Speiseeis in Bechern[2000/16]
English:Method and system for filling ice cream into cup shaped containers[2000/16]
French:Méthode et dispositif de remplissage de pots avec de la crème glacée[2000/16]
Examination procedure05.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/30]
03.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.11.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.11.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.11.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US3865281  (BYRD CARL, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 9, line 27 - column 9, line 40 * * figure 2A *;
 [A]US3648741  (CROASDALE WILLIAM HERBERT, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 7, line 41 - column 7, line 57 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5515888  (GRAFFIN ANDRE J J [FR]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 62 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0366454  (KURASHIKI BOSEKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 7, line 56 - column 9, line 39 * * figure 2 *