EP0931878 - Fountain coating applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [1999/30] | For all designated states BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bassett, William J. 611 W. Beloit Street Orfordville, Wisconsin 53576 / US | 02 /
Goecks, Roger L. 2133 East Ridge Road Beloit, Wisconsin 53511 / US | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 99630010.9 | 22.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | US19980072742P | 27.01.1998 Original published format: US 72742 P | US19990226700 | 07.01.1999 Original published format: US 226700 | [1999/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0931878 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0931878 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0931878 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/32 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
D21H23/32 (EP,KR,US);
B05C1/0813 (EP,KR,US);
B05C11/048 (KR);
B05C3/18 (EP,KR,US);
B05C11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/02] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Beschichtungsvorrichtung | [1999/30] | English: | Fountain coating applicator | [1999/30] | French: | Dispositif d'enduction | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0385301 (ELASTOGRAN POLYURETHANE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]DE4203398 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [Y] 4,5,14,18,22 * column 6, line 22 - line 54; figure 7 *; | [XY]EP0514735 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 18,22 * figures 1-3; claims 1-6 * [Y] 4,5,14,18,22; | [YA]US5269846 (ESKELINEN JUHANI [FI], et al) [Y] 22 * figure 1; claims 1-8 * [A] 1-21,23-25; | [A]WO9607790 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * figure 1; claims 1-26 *; | [A]DE4432180 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1-25 * figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE4432177 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0781608 (VALMET CORP [FI]) [X] 18,22 * figure 3; claims 1-7 * [Y] 4,5,14,18,22 |