Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969281

EP0969281 - The use of screen-printed electrodes in the electrochemical analysis of electroactive species [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University College Cork-National University of Ireland, Cork
College Road
Cork / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
University College Cork-National University of Ireland, Cork
College Road
Cork / IE
Inventor(s)01 / Lane, William
Coillin, Sraleigh
Waterfall, Co. Cork / IE
02 / Newton, Hazel Victoria
50 Quaker Road
Cork / IE
03 / Hill, Martin Jude Mary
48 Clifton Grange
Douglas, Co. Cork / IE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2000/01]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date99650054.230.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateIE1998000052930.06.1998         Original published format: IE 980529
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969281
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969281
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/30
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von siebgedrückten Elektroden für die elektrochemische Analyse von elektroaktiven Werkstoffen[2000/01]
English:The use of screen-printed electrodes in the electrochemical analysis of electroactive species[2000/01]
French:Utilisation d'électrodes sérigraphiées pour l'analyse électrochimique d'espèces électrochimiquement actives[2000/01]
Examination procedure08.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/10]
02.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/28]
11.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3929609  (GRAY DON N ET AL) [X] 1,15,21 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 50 *;
 [X]EP0333246  (UNILEVER NV ;UNILEVER PLC (GB)) [X] 1 * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 12 *;
 [AD]  - J. WANG, "remote electrochemical sensor for trace metal contaminants", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 67, pages 1481 - 1485, XP000885189 [AD] 1,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00104a029