EP0933287 - Arrangement in vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karhumäki, Jorma Korkokuja 1 33950 Pirkkala / FI | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Dahlström, Karl Krister Oy Kolster Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [1999/31] | Application number, filing date | 99660018.5 | 01.02.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | FI19980000230 | 02.02.1998 Original published format: FI 980230 | [1999/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933287 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933287 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D47/00 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
B62D47/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2001/04] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung in einem Fahrzeug | [1999/31] | English: | Arrangement in vehicle | [1999/31] | French: | Disposition dans un véhicule | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 18.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT | 02.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.12.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57172836 ; | [YA]FR2500509 (CHAUVET HENRI [FR]) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * page 1, line 5 - line 10; figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 18 - line 24 * [A] 5; | [A]US4964671 (MILLAR RUSSELL [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5706616 (FERNANDEZ HECTOR RAUL LOPEZ [MX]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 19 - line 23; figures 1,2,4 * * column 2, line 47 - line 56 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830122), vol. 007, no. 016, Database accession no. (M - 187), & JP57172836 A 19821023 (MASAYUKI KURASAKU) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * |