Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0960913

EP0960913 - Porous coating pigment and a method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.07.2005  [2005/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M-Real Oyj
Revontulentie 6
02100 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]For all designated states
M-real Oyj
Revontulentie 6
02100 Espoo / FI
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
Metsä-Serla Oyj
Revontulentie 6
02100 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Silenius, Petri
Raitapurontie 57
08500 Lohja as. / FI
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Sundman, Patrik Christoffer , et al
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]Sundman, Christoffer , et al
Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99660076.311.05.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateFI1998000104511.05.1998         Original published format: FI 981045
[1999/48]
Filing languageFI
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0960913
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0960913
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0960913
Date:04.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/02, D21H19/38
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   SE [2001/06]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesLT20.05.1999
TitleGerman:Poröses Beschichtungspigment und ein Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1999/48]
English:Porous coating pigment and a method for its production[1999/48]
French:Pigment de revètement poreux et procédé pour sa preparation[1999/48]
Examination procedure28.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
24.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2004Fee for grant paid
12.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
[2005/22]
Former [2005/18]FI04.08.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI04.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0411638  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,15,16,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0716931  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 1,17,18 * page 11 - page 12 *;
 [X]  M.I.ZAKI, "thermal decomposition and creation of reactive solid surfaces", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES, amsterdam, (1985), vol. 13, pages 323 - 332, XP000892974 [X] 1-5,9 * the whole document *
 [A]  H.H.WILLARD, "the determination of calcium by ignition of calcium oxalate to carbonate in air", J. AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1930), vol. 52, pages 1888 - 1892, XP000891670 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01368a019