Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994088

EP0994088 - Process for producing a fuel component [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neste Oil Oyj
Keilaranta 8
02150 Espoo / FI
[2006/47]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Fortum Oil and Gas Oy
Keilaniemi
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Aittamaa, Juhani
Parikkalantie 22
00920 Helsinki / FI
02 / Jakkula, Juha
Kivenhakkaajantie 9
04200 Kerava / FI
03 / Lindqvist, Petri
Huhtisentie 5 C 14
06100 Porvoo / FI
04 / Koskinen, Matti
Portimopolku 3 B 23
00800 Helsinki / FI
05 / Linnekoski, Juha
Metsäkuja 5 E 9
05460 Hyvinkää / FI
06 / Krause, Outi
Smedsinportti 1 B
02750 Espoo / FI
07 / Sourander, Mauri
Venemestarintie 8 D 15
00980 Helsinki / FI
08 / Ignatius, Jyrki
Suorannantie 21
06450 Porvoo / FI
09 / Pyhälahti, Antti
Albertinkatu 46 B 29
00180 Helsinki / FI
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Sundman, Patrik Christoffer , et al
Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Sundman, Christoffer , et al
Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99660161.318.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateFI1998000225016.10.1998         Original published format: FI 982250
US1999034355930.06.1999         Original published format: US 343559
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994088
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994088
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C2/08, C07C9/21, C07C11/02, C10L1/06
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Treibmittelbestandteils[2000/16]
English:Process for producing a fuel component[2000/16]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'un composant de carburant[2000/16]
Examination procedure14.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
05.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2004Fee for grant paid
22.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
 02  16.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Saipem S.p.A.
Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67
20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT
Opponent's representative
Zumstein, Angela, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/20]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
D-80339 München / DE
 02  16.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Saipem S.p.A.
Via Martiri di Cefalonia, 67
20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT
Opponent's representative
Zumstein, Angela, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2006/50]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
D-80339 München / DE
 02  16.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A.
Viale De Gasperi, 16 20097 - San Donato Milanese
Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Former [2006/49]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
D-80339 München / DE
 02  16.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A.
V.le De Gaspari, 16 20097 - S. Donato Milanese
Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Reitzle, Helmut, et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Former [2006/37]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR, et al
Theresienhöhe 13
D-80339 München / DE
 02  16.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A.
V.le De Gaspari, 16
20097 - S. Donato Milanese, Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Reitzle, Helmut, Dr.
Butenschön, Bergmann, Reitzle, Nöth, Grambow, Kraus, Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/19]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Zumstein, Fritz, Dr.
Zumstein & Klingseisen, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
 02  16.03.2005  30.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SNAMPROGETTI S.p.A.
V.le De Gaspari, 16
20097 - S. Donato Milanese, Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Reitzle, Helmut, Dr.
Butenschön, Bergmann, Reitzle, Nöth, Grambow, Kraus, Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/18]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2005  17.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Catalytic Distillation Technologies
10100 Bay Area Boulevard
Pasadena, Texas 77507 / US
Opponent's representative
Zumstein, Fritz, Dr.
Zumstein & Klingseisen, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
22.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.01.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.06.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.05.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/44]
06.05.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition17.08.2007Appeal received No.  T1397/07
26.10.2007Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
08.08.2007Appeal received No.  T1397/07
26.10.2007Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2010Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
06.05.2010Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:14.10.2003Request for further processing filed
14.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.10.2003Decision despatched
03.09.2002Request for further processing filed
04.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.09.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
CY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
IE18.10.2004
LU18.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
PT16.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
CY16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
IE18.10.2004
LU18.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/13]BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
NL16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
IE18.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/22]BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
DK16.09.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/14]BE16.06.2004
CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
GR16.09.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH16.06.2004
FI16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
SE16.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH16.06.2004
LI16.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]GB522818  (LES USINES DE MELLE) [X] 1,4,19,36 * claim - *;
 [A]US2363300  (A. E. DUNSTAN ET AL) [A] 19 * claim - *