Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999649

EP0999649 - Method and arrangement for linearizing a radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.06.2007  [2007/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2002/11]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD.
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Rauhala, Antti
Takapellontie 4 A 2
25130 Muurla / FI
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo
Berggren Oy Ab
P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo
Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99660173.802.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateFI1998000240906.11.1998         Original published format: FI 982409
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999649
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999649
Date:14.05.2003
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999649
Date:28.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/10, H04B17/00
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/07]
Former [2004/06]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren ond Schaltung zur linearisierung eines Funkempfängers[2000/19]
English:Method and arrangement for linearizing a radio receiver[2000/19]
French:Procédé et circuit de linéarisation d'un récepteur radio[2005/27]
Former [2000/19]Procedé et circuit de linéarisation d'um récepteur radio
Examination procedure19.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/38]
10.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.11.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.02.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT
20.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2005Fee for grant paid
29.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Request for further processing for:25.04.2005Request for further processing filed
25.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.12.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0814567  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9,11,14,15,17-24 * the whole document * [A] 2,16 [Y] 3,8,10,12,13;
 [XA]WO9406213  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 3-14,17-24;
 [XAY]US5179724  (LINDOFF MATS E G [SE]) [X] 1,2,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 3-7,9,11,14,17-24 [Y] 8,10,12,13;
 [YA]US5222255  (KUO YAO H [US], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-24;
 [YA]US5761614  (LEITCH NEIL G [US], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4-24