Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972572

EP0972572 - High efficiency cyclones [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB
published on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ribera Salcedo, Romualdo Luis
Faculdade de Engenharia do Porto
Departamento de Engenharia Quimica
Rua dos Bragas, s/n
4050 Porto / PT
[N/P]
Former [2006/49]For all designated states
Ribera Salcedo, Romualdo Luis
Faculdade de Engenharia do Porto, Departamento de Engenharia Quimica, Rua dos Bragas, s/n
4050 Porto / PT
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Ribera Salcedo, Romualdo Luis
Faculdade de Engenharia do Porto, Departamento de Engenharia Quimica, Rua dos Bragas, s/n
4050 Porto / PT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Pelayo de Sousa Henriques, Rui
Arlindo de Sousa - Marcas e Patentes, LDA., Rua de Sá da Bandeira, 706-6o.Dto.
4000-432 Porto / PT
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Pelayo de Sousa Henriques, Rui
Arlindo de Sousa - Marcas e Patentes, LDA., Rua de Sá da Bandeira, 706-2. Esq.
4000-432 Porto / PT
Application number, filing date99670006.808.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, datePT1998010216608.06.1998         Original published format: PT 10216698
[2000/03]
Filing languagePT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972572
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972572
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972572
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:B04C5/081
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/51]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC 
Former [2001/49]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hocheffiziente Zyklone[2000/03]
English:High efficiency cyclones[2000/03]
French:Cyclones à haute efficacité[2000/03]
Examination procedure14.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/50]
14.09.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.02.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, LU, MC
19.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2006Fee for grant paid
19.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.11.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
DK06.03.2007
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
IE08.06.2007
[2013/46]
Former [2010/06]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
DK06.03.2007
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
GB08.06.2007
IE08.06.2007
Former [2008/25]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
GB08.06.2007
IE08.06.2007
Former [2008/21]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
Former [2007/30]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0564992  (KRANTZ H GMBH & CO [DE]) [AD] 1-3,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]  DIETZ P W, "ELECTROSTATICALLY ENHANCED CYCLONE SEPARATORS", POWDER TECHNOLOGY,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, (1982), vol. 31, no. 221, ISSN 0032-5910, pages 221 - 226, XP000575779 [A] 1-3 * figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-5910(82)89008-6
 [A]  MAROULIS Z B ET AL, "Development of an Effective Cyclone Simulator under Excel", FILTRATION AND SEPARATION,GB,CROYDON, (19951112), vol. 32, no. 10, ISSN 0015-1882, pages 969 - 976,968, XP004137497 [A] 1-3 * figure 1; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0015-1882(97)84191-2