Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995615

EP0995615 - Manual writing or dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berol Corporation
29 E. Stephenson Street
Freeport, IL 61032 / US
[2002/24]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Anderka, Gerold
In de Musen 16
25474 Bönningstedt / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Anderka, Gerold
Holsteiner Chaussee 439
25474 Ellerbek / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Anderka, Gerold
In de Musen 16
25474 Bönningstedt / DE
 [2002/24]
Former [2000/17]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]Winkler, Andreas, Dr. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99710009.421.09.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE1998219071U20.10.1998         Original published format: DE 29819071 U
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995615
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995615
Date:21.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B43K5/18
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/06]
Former [2001/05]AT,  DE,  FR,  IT 
Former [2001/02]DE,  FR,  IT 
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Handschreib- oder Auftraggerät[2000/17]
English:Manual writing or dispensing device[2000/17]
French:Instrument manuel pour écrire ou pour applicateur[2000/17]
Examination procedure28.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
27.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
15.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2003Fee for grant paid
11.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   08.12.2000
01.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.2002
30.09.200204   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2003
30.09.200305   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2003
Documents cited:Search[YD]DE4313180  (ROTRING INT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9516577  (PARKER PEN PRODUCTS [GB], et al) [Y] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0476492  (HORI JIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4313180