Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0931943

EP0931943 - Fixing device for flat elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYMA INTERCONTINENTAL AG
Rosenberg
CH-9533 Kirchberg / CH
[1999/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Strässle, Marcel
Rosenbergstrasse 29
9533 Kirchberg (SG) / CH
02 / Züllig, Kurt
Rosenbergstrasse 23
9533 Kirchberg (SG) / CH
[1999/30]
Representative(s)Liebetanz, Michael , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/30]Liebetanz, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99810002.805.01.1999
[1999/30]
Priority number, dateCH1998000014722.01.1998         Original published format: CH 14798
[1999/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0931943
Date:28.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0931943
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0931943
Date:20.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16B5/06, E06B3/54, E04F13/14, E04B2/82, G09F7/18, E04F13/08
[2000/47]
Former International [1999/30]F16B5/06, E06B3/54, E04F13/14, E04B2/82, G09F7/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/32]
Former [1999/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesRO09.05.2001
SI09.05.2001
TitleGerman:Befestigungvorrichtung für flächenhafte Elemente[1999/30]
English:Fixing device for flat elements[1999/30]
French:Dispositif de fixation pour éléments plats[1999/30]
Examination procedure09.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
23.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, IE, MC
06.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2003Fee for grant paid
12.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
FR20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
IT20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
LU05.01.2004
PT20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]CY20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
FR20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
LU05.01.2004
PT20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2006/14]FI20.08.2003
FR20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
LU05.01.2004
PT20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2005/23]FI20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
LU05.01.2004
PT20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2005/14]FI20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
BE31.01.2004
Former [2004/46]FI20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/45]FI20.08.2003
GB20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/31]FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/29]FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/16]FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/13]FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
Former [2004/12]FI20.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2518361  (COUWENBERGS PAUL [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,7 *