Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0933480

EP0933480 - Flushing cistern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.02.2005  [2005/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prosan, d.o.o.
Smolnik 17
2342 Ruse / SI
[1999/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Vogrinec, Ludvik
2342 Ruse / SL
[1999/31]
Representative(s)Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/31]Groner, Manfred , et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99810019.214.01.1999
[1999/31]
Priority number, dateCH1998000021028.01.1998         Original published format: CH 21098
[1999/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0933480
Date:04.08.1999
Language:DE
[1999/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0933480
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:E03D1/012
[1999/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/40]
Former [1999/31]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI18.03.2000
TitleGerman:Spülkasten[1999/31]
English:Flushing cistern[1999/31]
French:Réservoir de chasse d'eau[1999/31]
Examination procedure18.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, CY, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
25.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/08]
20.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2000CH   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000CY   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000DK   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000FI   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000GB   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000GR   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000IE   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000LU   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000MC   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000PT   M02   Not yet paid
25.08.2000SE   M02   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0588766  (GEBERIT AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0201768  (SANBLOC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0731223  (MERO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 *;
 [X]DE8508107U  (RÖMPLER-BURDA) [X] 18 * page 3, line 15 - page 3, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE29506237U  (GEBERIT AG [CH])
by applicantEP0588766