Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034827

EP1034827 - Deaeration apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.01.2002  [2002/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stücklin & Cie AG
Mühlerainstrasse 26
4414 Füllinsdorf / CH
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Steffan, Helmut
Arend-Braye-Weg 12
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Bollhalder, Renato , et al
Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Bollhalder, Renato , et al
A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date99810200.808.03.1999
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034827
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D19/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Entgasungsvorrichtung[2000/37]
English:Deaeration apparatus[2000/37]
French:Dispositif de dégazage[2000/37]
Examination procedure14.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/05]
07.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/05]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.05.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2335238  (SENING FA F A) [A] 1,5,9 * page 8, line 5 - page 14, paragraph 2; figure - *;
 [A]WO9714922  (STUECKLIN & CIE AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9600604  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *