Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034726

EP1034726 - A method of connecting an anchoring piece of plastics material to a structural element of wood, anchoring piece, structural element and slatted bed base according to that method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Recticel Bedding (Schweiz) GmbH
Bettenweg 12
6233 Büron/LU / CH
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Eglin, Thomas
Schulstrasse 6
5013 Niedergösgen / CH
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Wagner, Wolfgang Heribert
Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG
Apollostrasse 2
Postfach 1021
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Wagner, Wolfgang, Dr. Phil., Dipl.-Phys.
c/o Zimmerli, Wagner & Partner AG Löwenstrasse 19
8001 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99810206.509.03.1999
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034726
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47C23/06
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL [2001/22]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Verbinden eines Verankerungsteils aus Kunststoff mit einem Bauteil aus Holz, Verankerungsteil, Verbindungsteil sowie Lattenuntermatratze[2000/37]
English:A method of connecting an anchoring piece of plastics material to a structural element of wood, anchoring piece, structural element and slatted bed base according to that method[2000/37]
French:Procédé d'assemblage d'une pièce d'ancrage en matière plastique à un élément de construction en bois, pièce d'ancrage, élément de construction et sommier à lattes selon ce procédé[2000/37]
Examination procedure13.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/19]
16.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
18.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9842988  (CREAHOLIC SA [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 10 * * page 13, line 22 - page 15, line 24 * * figures 1,3-7 * [A] 2-21;
 [A]DE29805898U  (HEIDINGER FLORIAN DR [DE], et al) [A] 22 * page 5, line 18 - line 21 * * page 8, line 15 - line 17 * * figure - *