blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1048332


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.02.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  03.04.2002  [2002/14]
10.10.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
04.10.2001 Change - extension states
12.07.2001 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
12.07.2001 Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973)
01.06.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  18.07.2001 [2001/29]
31.05.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
15.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]