Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048332

EP1048332 - Device and method for releasing reactants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
METROHM AG
Oberdorfstrasse 68
9100 Herisau / CH
[2000/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Schäfer, Helwig, Dr.
Gibelhalde 5
9101 Herisan / CH
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date99810355.027.04.1999
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048332
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D15/08, G01N30/34, G01N1/38, B01J4/02
[2000/44]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/29]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Freisetzen von Reagenzien[2000/44]
English:Device and method for releasing reactants[2000/44]
French:Dispositif et méthode de distribution de réactifs[2000/44]
Examination procedure03.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/14]
12.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/14]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.07.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE19715322  (GKSS-FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GEESTHACHT) [DX] 1-3,11 * page 3, line 50 - line 64; claim 4 * * page 4, line 47 - line 48 *;
 [A]GB2171926  (THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY) [A] 1,8,11,15 * page 1, line 27 - line 33 *