Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972507

EP0972507 - Lid foil with conductor tracks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2001
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2001 [2001/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alusuisse Technology & Management AG
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Styger, Christian
Lahmerstrasse 4
8247 Flurlingen / CH
02 / Lüthi, Markus
Maiegass 10
8460 Marthalen / CH
03 / Linsi, Thomas
Hornbergstrasse 4
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
04 / Lohwasser, Wolfgang
Friedhofstrasse 4
78262 Gailingen / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99810435.019.05.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateCH1998000118129.05.1998         Original published format: CH 118198
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972507
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61J7/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Deckelfolie mit Leiterbahnen[2000/03]
English:Lid foil with conductor tracks[2000/03]
French:Feuille de fermeture avec pistes conductrices[2000/03]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/16]
21.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0796605  (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0129785  (SIMON UDO) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5313439  (ALBECK DAN [IL]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 55 - column 8, line 10; figures 2A-4B *;
 [A]US4616316  (HANPETER JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-5 *
by applicantEP0129785
 EP0796605