Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054072

EP1054072 - Nickel base superalloy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 21.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
[2002/16]
Former [2001/29]For all designated states
ALSTOM (Schweiz) AG
Haselstrasse 16
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
ABB ALSTOM POWER (Schweiz) AG
5401 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Fernihough, John, Dr.
Maederstrasse 15
5400 Baden / CH
02 / Konter, Maxim, Dr.
Sommerweg 13B
5313 Klingnau / CH
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Pöpper, Evamaria , et al
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
CHTI Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Pöpper, Evamaria , et al
ALSTOM Technologie AG CHTI Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7/688/5
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2000/47]Pöpper, Evamaria, Dr. , et al
ABB Business Services Ltd Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16 Bldg. 699
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date99810443.420.05.1999
[2000/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054072
Date:22.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054072
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C22C19/05
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2001/32]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nickel-Basis-Superlegierung[2000/47]
English:Nickel base superalloy[2000/47]
French:Superalliage à base de Nickel[2000/47]
Examination procedure21.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
06.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.09.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2002Fee for grant paid
20.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9748827  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-16;
 [A]WO9748828  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-16
 [A]  CARUEL, F. ET AL, "SNECMA experience with cost-effective DS airfoil technology applied using CM 186 LC alloy", J. ENG. GAS TURBINES POWER (1998), 120(1), 97-104, (1998), XP002120758 [A] 1-16
 [A]  HARRIS, K. ET AL, "Development of two rhenium-containing superalloys for single-crystal blad and directionally solidified vane applications in advanced turbine engine", J. MATER. ENG. PERFORM. (1993), 2(4), 481-7, (1993), XP002120759 [A] 1-16
 [A]  QUIGG, R. J., "New alloy developments in single crystal and DS alloys", HIGH TEMP. MATER. PROCESSES (1993), 11(1-4), 247-54, (1993), XP002120760 [A] 1-16