Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057745

EP1057745 - Child resistant tablets package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcan Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
[2001/46]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Alusuisse Technology & Management AG
Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16
8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Kancsar, Peter
Breitensteinstr. 50
8037 Zürich / CH
02 / Zellweger, Laurenz
Ackerstr. 53
8005 Zürich / CH
03 / Krohn, Michael
Schreinerstr. 50
8004 Zürich / CH
04 / Schmauder, Claudia
Zollstr. 54
8005 Zürich / CH
05 / Marti, Susanne
Schreinerstr. 50
8004 Zürich / CH
[2000/49]
Application number, filing date99810481.402.06.1999
[2000/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1057745
Date:06.12.2000
Language:DE
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057745
Date:26.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65D75/52, B65D75/34, B65D75/38, B65D75/58
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/06]
Former [2001/34]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  LI,  SE 
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI06.06.2001
TitleGerman:Kindersichere Verpackung für Tabletten[2000/49]
English:Child resistant tablets package[2000/49]
French:Emballage pour comprimés avec sécurité pour enfants[2002/30]
Former [2000/49]Emballage pour tablettes inviolable par les enfants
Examination procedure06.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
07.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2002Fee for grant paid
27.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US3912081  (HAINES RUSSELL R, et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,13 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 11; figure 6 *;
 [X]US3302777  (SPARKS GEORGE C) [X] 1-3,5 * figure - *;
 [A]US4422551  (PAWLOWSKI THOMAS D [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 34 - line 43; figure - *;
 [A]US4666040  (MURATA TAKAAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2227190  (ALUSUISSE [CH])
ExaminationUS5339960