Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972615

EP0972615 - Powder-actuated fastener driving tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Grazioli, Mario
Gemsweg 8
7000 Chur / CH
02 / Gantner, Gebhard
Bragadellaweg 27
6710 Nenzing / AT
03 / Renner, Sybille
Glockenweg 1
9472 Grabs / CH
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland , et al
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Wildi, Roland , et al
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333
9494 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date99810534.017.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813105313.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831053
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972615
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972615
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972615
Date:22.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B25C1/18
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/52]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pulverkraftbetriebenes Setzgerät[2000/03]
English:Powder-actuated fastener driving tool[2000/03]
French:Outil de scellement actionné par poudre[2000/03]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
17.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2003Fee for grant paid
20.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US3399817  (KARL DIEHL) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 20 - line 46; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 75 - column 5, line 3 *;
 [XA]EP0798084  (SPIT SOC PROSPECT INV TECHN [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 4,5;
 [DA]EP0330950  (HILTI AG [LI]) [DA] 1,6 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19544104  (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *
by applicantEP0330950