Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971212

EP0971212 - Method to determine the pressure loss and the flow rate through a pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2012
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2012  [2012/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Levitronix LLC
85 First Avenue
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2001/23]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Sulzer Electronics AG
Hegifeldstrasse 30, Postfach 56
8409 Winterthur / CH
For all designated states
LUST ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GmbH
Gewerbestrasse 5-9
35633 Lahnau-Waldgirmes / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schöb, Reto, Dr.
Ackerstrasse 75E
8604 Volketswil / CH
02 / Barletta, Natale
Rötelstrasse 39
8037 Zürich / CH
03 / Hahn, Jürgen
Friedaustrasse 8
8003 Zürich / CH
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14
8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Sulzer Management AG
Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Former [2000/02]Sulzer Management AG
KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12
8401 Winterthur / CH
Application number, filing date99810573.802.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateEP1998081065710.07.1998         Original published format: EP 98810657
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971212
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971212
Date:20.04.2011
Language:DE
[2011/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/80, G01N11/16, F04D29/04, A61M1/10
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [2000/39]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Druckverlustes und des Durchflusses durch eine Pumpe[2000/02]
English:Method to determine the pressure loss and the flow rate through a pump[2000/02]
French:Méthode pour déterminer la perte de pression et le débit d'une pompe[2000/02]
Examination procedure15.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2011Fee for grant paid
05.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
20.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DXAY]US5725357  (NAKAZEKI TSUGITO [JP], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-8,15-17,22 * the whole document * [A] 10-14,19-21 [Y] 3,9,18;
 [Y]US5613831  (LIEGAT SIEGFRIED [DE]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 4 - line 15 *;
 [Y]US4779614  (MOISE JOHN C [US]) [Y] 9 * abstract *;
 [Y]US4341111  (HUSAR DIETER) [Y] 18 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4781525  (HUBBARD LLOYD C [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,4-8,15-17,22 * the whole document *