Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978411

EP0978411 - Method for determining electrical properties of a railway supply network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler Rail Systems GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Technology) GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Meyer, Markus
Höchweidstrasse 7
6030 Ebikon / CH
02 / Petersen, Anders, Dr.
Starrbäcksgatan 9C
S-17274 Sundbyberg / SE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Thielmann, Andreas , et al
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Dusseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Thielmann, Andreas , et al
Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29
40435 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2001/15]Gmeiner, Christa, c/o DaimlerChrysler AG , et al
Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstrasse 10/Geb. 17
89077 Ulm / DE
Former [2000/32](deleted)
...
Former [2000/06]Kaiser, Helmut, Dr. , et al
ABB Business Services Ltd., Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16 / Bldg 699
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date99810583.705.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813536505.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835365
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978411
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978411
Date:28.11.2007
Language:DE
[2007/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60M3/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ermittlung elektrischer Eigenschaften eines Bahnnetzes[2000/06]
English:Method for determining electrical properties of a railway supply network[2000/06]
French:Procédé pour déterminer les caractéristiques électriques d'un réseau d'alimentation de chemin de fer[2000/06]
Examination procedure25.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
26.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2007Fee for grant paid
17.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Request for further processing for:26.07.2006Request for further processing filed
26.07.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.08.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
13.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09188253  ;
 [A]JPH0834267
 [A]  - PETROV + GRIMALSKI, "Berechnung der elektrischen Grössen in Oberleitungen und Schienen von Wechselstrombahnen", ELEKTRISCHE BAHNEN, munchen, (199011), vol. 88, no. 11, pages 398 - 402, XP000165217 [A] 1,2,6 * page 399 - page 400 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, [A] 1,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - CHANG, CHAN, HO & LEE, "AI applications and solution techniques for AC-railway-system control and simulation", IEE-PROCEEDINGS-B, stevenage, (199305), vol. 140, no. 3, pages 166 - 176, XP000304270 [A] 1,6 * page 167, column 2 - page 169, column 2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 6, [A] 1,6 * abstract *