blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972600

EP0972600 - Apparatus for CNC-cutting of sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MABI AG
Werdstrasse 10
5106 Veltheim / CH
[2002/18]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MABI AG
Schulstrasse 5
CH-5200 Windisch / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Biland, Max
Werdstrasse 10
5106 Veltheim / CH
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Groner, Manfred, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Gotthardstrasse 53
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Groner, Manfred, et al
Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940
8023 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99810593.606.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateCH1998000150813.07.1998         Original published format: CH 150898
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972600
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972600
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972600
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:B23D33/02, B26F1/38, B23D15/06, B23D27/00, B21D43/28
[2000/23]
CPC:
B23D27/00 (EP); B23D33/02 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/03]B23D33/02, B26F1/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum rechnergesteuerten Formschneiden von Blechen[2000/03]
English:Apparatus for CNC-cutting of sheets[2000/03]
French:Dispositif pour couper des plaques métalliques en utilisant un ordinateur[2000/03]
Examination procedure31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
21.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2002Fee for grant paid
08.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.09.2002
GB11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
IE11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DK11.12.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2007/21]
Former [2004/21]FI11.09.2002
GB11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
IE11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/05]FI11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
IE11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/42]FI11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
IE11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
Former [2003/22]FI11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
PT17.12.2002
Former [2003/20]FI11.09.2002
GR11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2717508  (POTOMAC APPLIED MECHANICS) [Y] 6,7 * page 17, line 1 - page 35, line 3; figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]DE2913747  (PULLMAX AB) [Y] 9,10* page 9, line 15 - line 36; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4364554  (AKERS ROY) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 43; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP0482702  (SALVAGNINI SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * column 3, line 37 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-10 *
by applicantEP0620072
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.